9
|
|
9
order
Order
Tue 09/03 2:03 PM
TEXT ORDER Due to a change in the Court's schedule, the Pre-Motion Conference on Defendant's Proposed Motion to Dismiss scheduled for Wednesday September 4 at 11:30 a.m. is hereby RESCHEDULED to Tuesday September 10 at 9:30 a.m. Please mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 09/03/2024. (Costigan, Roberta)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
order
Text Order
Thu 08/22 12:27 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon the Pre-Motion Letters submitted by Plaintiff Luis Lugo and Defendant Carvana LLC, [Docket Nos. 5, 7], concerning a proposed motion to dismiss by Carvana. Having read those letters, the Court will hold a pre-motion conference via Microsoft Teams on September 4 at 11:30 a.m. The Court will send the Teams link to Counsels' email addresses as they appear on the docket. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/22/2024. (tf, )
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
misc
Letter
Thu 08/15 3:31 PM
Letter from Attorney, Elizabeth Brennan. (BRENNAN, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
order
Order
Tue 08/13 10:18 AM
TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon the pre-motion letter filed by Defendant Carvana LLC on July 26, 2024. [Docket No. 5.] Plaintiff Luis Lugo has failed to address Defendant's letter within seven (7) days as required by Rule I.A. of this Court's Individual Rules and Procedures, available at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/ProceduresJudgeReneeMarieBumb.pdf. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause by no later than August 16, 2024, why he has failed to timely respond AND why the relief Defendant seeks in its pre-motion letter should not be granted. If no response is filed, the Court will likely grant Defendant the relief its proposed motion seeks. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 08/13/2024. (Costigan, Roberta)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
misc
Letter
Fri 07/26 11:06 AM
Letter from Defendant Carvana, LLC to Chief Judge Bumb Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference. (POLLACK, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/25 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY D. POLLACK on behalf of CARVANA, LLC (POLLACK, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 07/23 2:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal and Exhibits served on Plaintiff's Counsel on 7/19/2024, filed by CARVANA, LLC. (LAWLER, RYAN)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
Tue 07/23 2:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CARVANA, LLC identifying Carvana Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (LAWLER, RYAN)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
qc
QC - Disclosure Statement filed as an Attachment
Tue 07/23 1:32 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Remvoal filed by CARVANA, LLC on 07/19/2024 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (aji, ) Modified on 7/23/2024 (tf, )
Related: [-]
|
|
|
notice
Notice of Judicial Preferences
Mon 07/22 1:07 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (aji, )
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/19 8:21 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CARVANA, LLC from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY BURLINGTON COUNTY - LAW DIV., case number BUR L 001201 24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15528661), filed by CARVANA, LLC.(LAWLER, RYAN)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit Complaint,
|
| |
Att: 2
Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 3
Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure,
|
| |
Att: 4
Statement Rule 11.2 Disclosure
|
|
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/22 12:03 PM
Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (dmw)
Related: [-]
|