21
|
|
21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case
Sat 08/10 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Related [+] Notice Date 08/09/2024. (Admin.)
|
20
|
|
20
trustee
Ch. 11 Subch V Trustee's Report of No Distribution C-case dism or conv, fee award recd
Thu 08/08 2:18 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution C-case dism or conv, fee award not recd. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $0.00, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Trustee Maria Yip. (Yip, Maria)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case (Other)
Wed 08/07 8:47 AM
Order Granting Emergency Motion of the United States Trustee to Dismiss Case . Dismissal Shall Be with Prejudice for 180 Days [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00] . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 07/26 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/25/2024. (Admin.)
|
17
|
|
17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 07/26 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/25/2024. (Admin.)
|
16
|
|
16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/25 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/24/2024. (Admin.)
|
15
|
|
15
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Tue 07/23 8:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Stuart M. Gold Esq. Filed by Creditor JGD Capital, LLC.. (Gold, Stuart)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
court
Meeting of Creditors 11
Tue 07/23 9:02 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 8/23/2024 at 01:30 PM at by U.S. Trustee TELECONFERENCE. To participate call 866-915-4419 passcode 6071331. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 10/22/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 9/27/2024. (Gonzalez, Maria)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
3
pgs
order
Order Setting Hearing
Tue 07/23 8:52 AM
Order Scheduling Chapter 11 Subchapter V Planning Conference Related [+]. Planning Conference scheduled for 08/07/2024 at 11:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
|
12
|
|
12
court
Meeting of Creditors 11
Mon 07/22 10:24 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 8/23/2024 at 01:30 PM at by U.S. Trustee TELECONFERENCE. To participate call 866-915-4419 passcode 6071331. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 10/22/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 9/27/2024. (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Mon 07/22 1:53 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Heidi A Feinman Related [+]. (Feinman, Heidi)
|
10
|
|
10
court
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Mon 07/22 11:44 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/29/2024 at 11:30 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
|
9
|
|
9
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 07/22 11:16 AM
Emergency Motion to Dismiss Case And Request for Expedited Hearing Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee (Feinman, Heidi)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference
Mon 07/22 10:33 AM
Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference, Claims Bar Date, and Deadline for Elections Under 11 U.S.C. § 1111(b). Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1188(c), the Debtor Must File a Report no Later than 14 days Before the Date of the Status Conference . Status hearing to be held on 09/04/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
1
pgs
notice
UST Notice Appointing Trustee
Mon 07/22 10:04 AM
Notice Appointing Maria Yip as Subchapter V Trustee . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.(Feinman, Heidi)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
1 pgs
Verified Statement
|
6
|
|
6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 07/22 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/21/2024. (Admin.)
|
5
|
|
5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 07/22 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/21/2024. (Admin.)
|
4
|
|
4
1
pgs
order
Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business
Fri 07/19 12:26 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
court
Notice of Deficiency
Fri 07/19 12:22 PM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 7/26/2024]. Deadline for Attorney Representation: 7/26/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement due 7/26/2024. Chapter 11 Small Business Documents and/or Subchapter V due by 7/26/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 8/2/2024. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 8/2/2024. Schedule A/B due 8/2/2024. Schedule D due 8/2/2024. Schedule E/F due 8/2/2024. Schedule G due 8/2/2024. Schedule H due 8/2/2024.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 8/2/2024.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 8/2/2024. [Incomplete Filings due by 8/2/2024]. (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Fri 07/19 12:07 PM
List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor Pedro Rodriguez Landscaping LLC . (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
5
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [OTC]
Fri 07/19 12:03 PM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition. Proofs of Claim due by 9/27/2024. (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)
Fri 07/19 5:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by ZC. Receipt Number 500302. (admin)
Related: [-]
|