Doe (A.K.) v. Uber Technologies, Inc et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04362 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Northern District of California, MDL 3084 CRB |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 2:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rasier-CA, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe (A.K.)
NACHAWATI LAW GROUP 5489 Blair Road
DALLAS, TX 75231 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 11:01 AM
Summons Issued as to Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 07/22 7:42 AM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Mon 07/22 11:04 AM
DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: Re: MDL 3084, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-04362-CRB, cc: JPMDL. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 07/19 9:22 AM
Proposed Summons. (Schulte, Steve) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 9:13 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19637417.). Filed by JANE DOE (AK).(Schulte, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |