United States of America v. Carpet Contractors, Inc., et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sallie Kim |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04366 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1345 Recovery of Debt to US |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 2:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
Demetris Botaitis
3210 Geary Blvd.
San Francisco, CA 94118 |
|
Defendant
Carpet Contractors, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
Schuerger Law Group Sheryl D. Noel 499 W. Shaw Avenue # 116
Fresno, CA 93704 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 09/04 1:37 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL filed by United States of America. (Noel, Sheryl) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 09/03 4:37 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OR DECLINATION: Defendant Carpet Contractors, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/17/2024 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 09/03 12:25 PM
STIPULATION RE: ENLARGE TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT filed by Carpet Contractors, Inc.. (Judd, Darin) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 08/20 1:18 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Noel, Sheryl) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Wed 08/07 11:09 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OR DECLINATION: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/21/2024 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 08/01 5:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Noel, Sheryl) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 07/31 5:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Noel, Sheryl) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 1:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Demetris Botaitis, Carpet Contractors, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 07/22 1:03 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 07/22 12:37 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2024. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 07/22 11:20 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by United States of America . (Noel, Sheryl) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 07/22 11:11 AM
Proposed Summons. (Noel, Sheryl) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 07/19 10:14 AM
Proposed Summons. (Noel, Sheryl) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 07/19 10:12 AM
Proposed Summons. (Noel, Sheryl) |
|
1 | 1
3
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 10:02 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by United States of America.(Noel, Sheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 07/19 10:50 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please file only one Summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by United States of America,3 Proposed Summons filed by United States of America (sec, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 07/19 11:29 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 form which can be downloaded fromhttps://www.cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Complaint filed by United States of America (sec, COURT STAFF) |