Cooper v. State
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert M Illman |
Referred: | Pslc Agb |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-04343 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/30 11:28 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gregory Cooper, Jr.. (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP
Tue 07/30 11:28 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory Cooper, Jr.(cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
oth_evt
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/19 9:24 AM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (cv, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
2 | 2
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: IFP
Fri 07/19 9:23 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/26/2024. (cv, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
utility
Remark
Fri 07/19 2:06 PM
Remark - Mailed copy of #2 and #3 to petitioner. (cv, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 07/22 8:52 AM
ORDER of USCA TRANSFERRING PETITION1 to the District Court. (cv, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/22/2024 (ljf, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Received Order
Fri 07/19 9:22 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER to CAND from U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit (cv, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/19/2024 (ljf, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 07/19 9:21 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Gregory Cooper, Jr.(cv, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/19/2024 (ljf, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |