Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-13597

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:John K Sherwood
Case #: 2:24-ap-01494
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2024
Terminated:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Madel A Mandap
118 Buckingham Drive
Hackensack, NJ 07601
Represented By
Madel A Mandap
contact info
Plaintiff
GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
40 WEST CENTURY ROAD
PARAMUS, NJ 07652
Represented By
Peter Adel Lawrence, I
Fein, Such, Kahn, & Shepard, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
utility Close Adversary Case Thu 03/27 9:09 AM
Adversary Case (2:24-ap-1494) Closed. (zlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 03/22 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/21/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 03/19 9:47 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER IN SETTLEMENT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ADVERSARY PROCEEDING. Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/18/2025. (zlh)
Related: [-] 7 Request to Enter Default Judgment Against MADEL A. MANDAP filed by Peter Adel Lawrence I on behalf of GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION.9 Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: Stipulated Order
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/11 8:41 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by R. A. Lebron on behalf of GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Lebron, R.)
Related: [-] 7 Request to Enter Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/25 3:21 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by R. A. Lebron on behalf of GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Lebron, R.)
Related: [-] 7 Request to Enter Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION,12 Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/25 8:35 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by R. A. Lebron on behalf of GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Lebron, R.)
Related: [-] 7 Request to Enter Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Thursday, February 13, 2025
11 11 court Certification of No Objection Thu 02/13 2:11 PM
Certification of No Objection in re: Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy. Related [+]. The Clerk hereby certifies that no objection to this Notice of Information has been filed. (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: Stipulated Order. Hearing scheduled for 02/18/2025. Filed by Peter Adel Lawrence I on behalf of GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. Objections due by 02/11/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service) filed by Plaintiff GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Thursday, January 23, 2025
court Hearing Held Thu 01/23 11:44 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Order to be Submitted Related [+] (mff)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Proof Hearing for: (related document:7 Request to Enter Default Judgment Against MADEL A. MANDAP filed by Peter Adel Lawrence I on behalf of GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION). The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant, Defendant's Attorney.Hearing scheduled for 11/26/2024 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (zlh) (Modified to reflect, defendant notice mailed on 10/29/2024) (zlh).
Saturday, January 18, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice (generic) Sun 01/19 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
9 9 misc Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy Wed 01/15 2:41 PM
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: Stipulated Order. Hearing scheduled for 02/18/2025. Filed by Peter Adel Lawrence I on behalf of GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. Objections due by 02/11/2025. (Lawrence, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, December 12, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 12/12 3:07 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 12/12/2024 Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Proof Hearing for: (related document:7 Request to Enter Default Judgment Against MADEL A. MANDAP filed by Peter Adel Lawrence I on behalf of GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION). The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant, Defendant's Attorney.Hearing scheduled for 11/26/2024 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (zlh) (Modified to reflect, defendant notice mailed on 10/29/2024) (zlh).
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
court Hearing Held and Continued Tue 11/26 2:36 PM
Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME: Debtor has until December 10, 2024 to file any pleadings. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2024 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Proof Hearing for: (related document:7 Request to Enter Default Judgment Against MADEL A. MANDAP filed by Peter Adel Lawrence I on behalf of GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION). The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant, Defendant's Attorney.Hearing scheduled for 11/26/2024 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (zlh) (Modified to reflect, defendant notice mailed on 10/29/2024) (zlh).
Monday, October 28, 2024
8 8 court Notice of Hearing - (Generic) Mon 10/28 8:37 AM
Notice of Proof Hearing for: Related [+]. The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant, Defendant's Attorney.Hearing scheduled for 11/26/2024 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (zlh)
Related: [-] 7 Request to Enter Default Judgment Against MADEL A. MANDAP filed by Peter Adel Lawrence I on behalf of GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Friday, October 25, 2024
7 7 misc Request to Enter Default Judgment Fri 10/25 11:17 AM
Request to Enter Default Judgment Against MADEL A. MANDAP filed by Peter Adel Lawrence I on behalf of GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Lawrence, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Certification
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 21, 2024
court Hearing Held Mon 10/21 2:24 PM
Minute of Hearing , OUTCOME: Default Entered Related [+] (zlh)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION for Service on Madel A Mandap Answer due on 8/19/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 10/22/2024 at 02:00 PM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attachment)
Friday, October 18, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 10/19 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
5 5 court Entry of Default Wed 10/16 9:11 AM
Entry of Default against Madel A. Mandap Related [+] The following parties were served: Plaintiff, Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant, Defendant's Attorney. (zlh)
Related: [-] 4 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
4 4 misc Request to Enter Default Tue 10/15 10:57 AM
Request to Enter Default Against Madel A. Mandap filed by Peter Adel Lawrence I on behalf of GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Lawrence, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification
Att: 2 Certification
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/24 10:32 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Peter Adel Lawrence I on behalf of GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (Lawrence, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION,2 Summons Issued
Friday, July 19, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 07/19 3:34 PM
Summons Issued to GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION for Service on Madel A Mandap Answer due on 8/19/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 10/22/2024 at 02:00 PM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (Browne, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Attachment
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/19 12:39 PM
Adversary case 24-01494 Complaint by GREATER ALLIANCE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION against Madel A Mandap. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Lawrence, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Att: 6 Exhibit
Att: 7 Exhibit