Landon v. Flint, City of et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen J Murphy, III |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11876 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
Emily Doerr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Flint, City of
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Kim
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Philip Moore
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sheldon Neeley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Reiter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amanda Trujillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karter Landon
12140 Francesca Dr.
Grand Blanc, MI 48439 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 08/13 4:34 PM
REPLY to Response re11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Karter Landon. [EXHIBITS ATTACHED WITHIN DOCUMENT] (JHea) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 08/12 10:54 PM
RESPONSE to11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Down, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/12 10:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Down, Chelsea) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Appearance
Mon 08/12 10:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Suzanne Down on behalf of All Defendants. (Down, Chelsea) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Attorney Appearance
Tue 08/06 6:13 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kendall B. Williams appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Williams, Kendall) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 07/22 2:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (SSch) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Mon 07/22 2:39 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Enforcement of Flint City Rental Inspection Code by Karter Landon. (SSch) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
Mon 07/22 10:16 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (EVra) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued*
Fri 07/19 1:46 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *William Kim* (TTho) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued*
Fri 07/19 1:45 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Philip Moore* (TTho) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued*
Fri 07/19 1:45 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Amanda Trujillo* (TTho) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued*
Fri 07/19 1:44 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Karter Landon* (TTho) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued*
Fri 07/19 1:43 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Emily Doerr* (TTho) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued*
Fri 07/19 1:43 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Sheldon Neeley* (TTho) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued*
Fri 07/19 1:42 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Flint, City of* (TTho) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Fri 07/19 1:41 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Karter Landon against All Defendants [Filing Fee paid, sent to Financial Dept.] (TTho) |