Hayden, III v. Lauderdale County Detention Facility
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Henry T Wingate |
Referred: | Lakeysha Greer Isaac |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00422 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response to Order
Thu 08/15 10:23 AM
Response to6 ORDER, filed by Owen Michael Hayden, III.(ND) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/07 11:06 AM
ORDER REQUIRING PETITIONER TO RESPOND. Petitioner's response due on or before August 28, 2024. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on August 7, 2024 (SGS) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 08/07 11:01 AM
ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; *RESTRICTED* granting4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on August 7, 2024 (SGS) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 08/01 1:02 PM
*RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Owen Michael Hayden, III.(ND) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order Opsp8
Mon 07/22 9:21 AM
ORDER: on or before 8/21/2024, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 7/22/2024 (LAT) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/19 1:00 PM
*RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Owen Michael Hayden, III.(KNS) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 07/19 12:58 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Owen Michael Hayden, III.(KNS) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Assignment |