Williams v. Cutwright
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David A Faber |
Referred: | Joseph Keith Reeder |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00366 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Transferring MJ Referral for Pretrial and PF&R
Tue 09/03 10:13 AM
CLERK'S ORDER. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert, the above-styled civil action is referred to Honorable Joseph Keith Reeder for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 9/3/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 08/05 11:37 AM
ORDER directing Respondent to answer or otherwise respond to the1 2241 Petition within 60 days of the entry of this Order. The Petitioner may file a reply to the answer or response of the Respondent within 60 days after service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 8/5/2024. (cc: Petitioner; USA w/2241 Petition) (mk) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 07/23 4:02 PM
Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number 2002774. (mfo) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Mag. Judge Eifert - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Mon 07/22 9:33 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/19 4:53 PM
NOTICE to Petitioner of Failure to Remit Filing Fee. (arb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus (2241)
Fri 07/19 4:36 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Jessica Sweeney Williams against Warden Cutwright pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (arb) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documentation, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Mon 07/22 9:28 AM
CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc) |