Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-01261

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:D Sims Crawford
Case #: 2:24-ap-00034
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2024
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alicia C. Stubbs
306 Westlake Circle SW Apt 237-F
Bessemer, AL 35020
Represented By
Alicia C. Stubbs
contact info
Plaintiff
America's First Federal Credit Union
Represented By
Michael Alan Harrison
Key, Greer, Frawley, Key & Harrison
contact info
Trustee
Bradford W. Caraway
Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P O Box 10848
Birmingham, AL 35202


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/24 7:29 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-34 Closed (rwh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 09/11 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Consent Judgment
Monday, September 09, 2024
4 4 order Consent Judgment Mon 09/09 2:32 PM
Consent Judgment Signed on 9/9/2024 Related [+]. (rwh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff America's First Federal Credit Union
Friday, July 19, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 07/19 3:57 PM
Summons Service Executed on America's First Federal Credit Union 7/19/2024 (Harrison, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 07/19 12:49 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conferenc Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/11/2024 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. (rwh)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff America's First Federal Credit Union
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/19 9:55 AM
Adversary case 24-00034 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by America's First Federal Credit Union against Alicia C. Stubbs. Fee Amount $350 (Harrison, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit