USAA Casualty Insurance Company v. Eleazer et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David S Leibowitz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-61284 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
AAO Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kirk Eleazer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USAA Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party
Fri 08/16 1:23 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 8/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Settlement - aty
Thu 08/15 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Settlement JOINT by United States of America (Petri, Steven) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Status Report
Thu 08/01 12:04 PM
STATUS REPORT DEFENDANT'S REMOVAL STATUS REPORT by United States of America(Petri, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A-5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit A-6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit A-7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit A-8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit A-9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit A-10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit A-11 | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Fri 07/26 1:47 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), DEFENDANT'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO SET ASIDE COUNTY CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO SERVE DEFENDANT AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by United States of America. Responses due by 8/9/2024.(Petri, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Compliance
Wed 07/24 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Compliance WITH TITLE 28, UNITED STATES CODE, SECTION 1446(d) by United States of America re1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Kirk Eleazer. Attorney Steven R. Petri added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Petri, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Status Report Order
Tue 07/23 2:37 PM
REMOVAL STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 8/2/2024. Signed by Judge David S. Leibowitz on 7/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Mon 07/22 9:31 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (jas) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 07/22 9:31 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
Fri 07/19 2:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - USAA Casualty Insurance Company a/s/o Diane Collibus, v. Kirk Eleazer and AAO Productions, Inc., COSO-24-023073, filing number 196164515) Filing fee $405.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by KIRK ELEAZER AND AAO PRODUCTIONS, INC.(Petri, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B |