Majestic Towing, Inc. v. PACCAR, Inc. et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Jerry W Blackwell |
Referred: | Leo I Brisbois |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02800 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
PACCAR, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Majestic Towing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Wholesale Truck-Trailer Parts, Inc.
Terminated: 08/19/2024
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 09/05 3:49 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ryan Bueche for PACCAR, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/5/2024. (CNO) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/04 2:45 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan C. Bueche. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-11329063 filed by PACCAR, Inc.. (Jakobe, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 09/03 2:10 PM
ORDER on9 Stipulation. PACCAR, Inc. answer due 9/17/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/3/2024.(JLB) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Wed 08/28 4:51 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re9 Stipulation. (Jakobe, Nicholas) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/28 4:49 PM
STIPULATION re6 Amended Complaint (Extend Time to Answer) by PACCAR, Inc.. (Jakobe, Nicholas) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/28 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas H Jakobe on behalf of PACCAR, Inc.. (Jakobe, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/20 12:44 PM
Summons Issued as to PACCAR, Inc. (BTX) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/19 2:15 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against PACCAR, Inc.. filed by Majestic Towing, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Savaloja, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A | ||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
6
pgs
order
Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court
Fri 08/02 12:41 PM
ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/2/2024.(JRG) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 9:56 AM
Summons Issued as to PACCAR, Inc., Wholesale Truck-Trailer Parts, Inc. (CLK) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 07/23 9:55 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24-cv-2800 JWB/LIB. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/23 9:19 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Majestic Towing Inc.. (Savaloja, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 9:17 AM
COMPLAINT Majestic Towing, Inc. against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11210316) filed by Majestic Towing Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Savaloja, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A |