Credit Consultative, Inc. v. XL Insurance America, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory H Woods |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-05487 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441in Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Eastern, 2:24-cv-01105 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
XL Insurance America Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Credit Consultative, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/04 5:25 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for John E. Carr to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (va) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/30 3:31 PM
MOTION for John E. Carr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29828386. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Credit Consultative, Inc...(Freiberg, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Fri 08/30 3:55 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 20 MOTION for John E. Carr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29828386. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc) |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Thu 08/29 12:49 AM
ORDER granting18 Letter Motion to Continue.Plaintiff's August 27, 2024 request to adjourn the initial pretrial conference, Dkt. No. 18, is granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for August 29, 2024 is adjourned to September 18, 2024 at 4:00 p.m. The joint status letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's July 19, 2024 order are due no later than September 11, 2024. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 18. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/18/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/28/2024) (jca) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Continue
Tue 08/27 11:23 PM
LETTER MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Peter N. Freiberg dated August 27, 2024. Document filed by Credit Consultative, Inc...(Freiberg, Peter) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Newton Freiberg on behalf of Credit Consultative, Inc...(Freiberg, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/30 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gerald Parker Dwyer, Jr on behalf of XL Insurance America Inc...(Dwyer, Gerald) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 07/22 10:54 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/29/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(B) of the Court's Individual Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/19/2024) (rro) |
|
14 | 14
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 07/19 2:26 PM
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number: 2:24-cv-01105. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice - Transfer Case
Fri 07/19 2:28 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vba) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 07/19 2:28 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 07/19 2:29 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vba) |
||
misc
Note to Out of State Attorneys
Fri 07/19 2:30 PM
NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order MDL Transfer Out
Thu 07/18 4:29 PM
ORDER AND REASONS granting9 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/18/2024.(my) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.] | |
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that XL Insurance's7 Motion to Opt-Out of the Streamlined Settlement Program is GRANTED IN PART to the extent necessary for Defendant to prosecute its pending motion to transfer venue. If that motion is denied or the case otherwise remains on the docket, it will remain subject to the Hurricane Ida CMO and the Streamlined Settlement Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/12/2024. (alm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.] | |
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re9 MOTION to Transfer Case . Signature block on pleading contains the name of an attorney who is not enrolled in this matter, Kevin Walsh. A motion to enroll and order is required to enroll. Any future pleadings containing the signature of an attorney not enrolled in this matter will not be accepted. (cs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.] | |
Wednesday, June 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by XL Insurance America, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/24/2024.(Knighton, Jeffrey) Modified text on 6/6/2024 (cs). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Submission, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re6 Response to Order to Show Cause: Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. No further action is necessary. (ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.] | |
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 MOTION To Opt Out of the Streamlined Settlement Program by XL Insurance America, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/12/2024.(Knighton, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Submission | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by XL Insurance America, Inc. re4 Directive of the Clerk(Knighton, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/17/2024 (ko). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" - Additional State Court Pleadings | ||
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court reallot this matter to another Section of this Court. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 5/2/2024.(mmv) (J. Fallon, Case Mgr, MJ Currault) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.] | |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 DIRECTIVE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal. By Clerk.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.] | |
3 | 3 HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.] | |
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 32nd JDC, Terrebonne Parish, case number 197900 Div. E (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BLAEDC-10509707) filed by XL Insurance America, Inc. Attorney Jeffrey Scott Knighton, Jr added to party XL Insurance America, Inc.(pty:dft).(Knighton, Jeffrey) Modified text on 5/1/2024 (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/19/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "A" - Petition for Damages, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "B" - Settlement Letter, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit "C" - PCG Estimate, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit "D" - State Court Record |