Jackson v. State of Mississippi
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel P Jordan, III |
Referred: | Andrew S Harris |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00424 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/04 12:40 PM
ORDER. ORDERED that pro se Petitioner Kenneth Wayne Jackson is granted until September 19, 2024, to pay the $5.00 filing in proper legal tender, such as cash or check made payable to the U.S. District Court or money order made payable to the U.S. District Court, or file a completed IFP Motion that includes having the Certificate portion completed and signed by an authorized officer of his present place of incarceration, or file an affidavit stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on 9/4/2024 (KNS) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response to Order
Tue 09/03 1:54 PM
Response to Order (Petition) re4 ORDER. ORDERED, that Petitioner on or before September 3, 2024, must complete and sign under penalty of perjury the attached form used to file a request for habeas relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. See order for details, filed by Kenneth Wayne Jackson.(KNS) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response to Order
Fri 08/30 10:22 AM
Amended Response to Order re3 ORDER: on or before 9/3/2024, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court, filed by Kenneth Wayne Jackson.(KNS) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - 10 stamps, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 08/30 10:19 AM
*RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re3 ORDER by Kenneth Wayne Jackson.(KNS) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Copy of Order, Doc. 3, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment - NEF for Order, Doc. 3, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
5 | 5
respm
Response to Order
Fri 08/30 10:16 AM
Response to Order re4 ORDER. ORDERED, that Petitioner on or before September 3, 2024, must complete and sign under penalty of perjury the attached form used to file a request for habeas relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254, filed by Kenneth Wayne Jackson.(KNS) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
utility
Remark
Fri 08/30 10:23 AM
Remark : Address updated/changed pursuant to envelope to Doc. 5: I.C.C.F. - E23L, P. O. Box 220, Mayersville, MS 39113. (KNS) |
||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/02 3:54 PM
ORDER. ORDERED, that Petitioner on or before September 3, 2024, must complete and sign under penalty of perjury the attached form used to file a request for habeas relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on 8/2/2024.(LAT) |
|
Att: 1 Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order Opsp8
Fri 08/02 3:49 PM
ORDER: on or before 9/3/2024, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on 8/2/2024 (LAT) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Authorization for Release of Account Information and Certificate
Fri 07/19 2:30 PM
AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE by Kenneth Wayne Jackson.(KNS) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 07/19 2:28 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kenneth Wayne Jackson.(KNS) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Assignment |