Arthur v. PLAZ CORPORATION
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Cristina D Silva |
Referred: | Elayna J Youchah |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01313 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 2:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
Plaz Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Phoenix Mercy Arthur
HKM Employment Attorneys LLP 101 Convention Center Drive, 600
Las Vegas, NV 89109 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/01 1:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phoenix Mercy Arthur re3 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Schreiber, Sara) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
order
Standing Order
Wed 07/24 12:07 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 9:16 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Plaz Corporation re1 Complaint. (AMMi) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Fri 07/19 12:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Phoenix Mercy Arthur. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schreiber, Sara) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 12:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7751480) by Phoenix Mercy Arthur. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/29/2024. Proof of service due by 10/17/2024. (Schreiber, Sara) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 07/22 9:13 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (AMMi) |