Uribe v. Dreesen et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Brenda Weksler |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01314 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice Change of Address
Mon 08/19 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Angelo Uribe. Address updated to 480 W. Bonanza Rd. Las Vegas, NV 89106 . (MAM) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint Amended
Thu 08/01 10:27 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Angelo Uribe. No changes to parties. (DLS) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/26 10:45 AM
ORDER. It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff's motion for clarification (ECF No.4 ) is construed as a motion for reconsideration, and it is denied. It is further ordered that the deadlines set in the Court's July 22, 2024, order (ECF No.3 ) to file a first amended complaint and either pay the full filing fee or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis remain in effect. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff Angelo Uribe a courtesy copy of his initiating documents (ECF Nos.1 ,1 -1,1 -2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/26/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG) ( For Distribution by law library. ) |
|
Att: 1 Courtesy Copy of | ||
Att: 1 , | ||
Att: 2 Courtesy Copy of | ||
Att: 1 -1, | ||
Att: 3 Courtesy Copy of | ||
Att: 1 -2 | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 07/25 8:26 AM
MOTION/Request for Clarification re3 Order, by Plaintiff Angelo Uribe. Responses due by 8/8/2024. (DLS) (misc) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/22 5:00 PM
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that Plaintiff has until 60 days from today (9/20/2024) , to submit a signed amended complaint to this Court. It is further ordered that Plaintiff has until 60 days from today (9/20/2024) , to either pay the full $405 filing fee or file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three required documents. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff Angelo Uribe (1) the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint and instructions for the same and (2) an application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate and instructions for the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/22/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint form/instructions, | ||
Att: 2 IFP form/instructions | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Fri 07/19 12:57 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. ( For Distribution by law library. ) (GA) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Receipt Initiating Documents
Fri 07/19 12:54 PM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (GA) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |