McQuaid v. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy Beetlestone |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03193 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, 240602455 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anna McQuaid
227 Thrush Circle
New Hope, PA 18938 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/24 12:28 PM
ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONEDCASE IS MAGISTRATE (SCOTT W. REID). IF THE DISTRICT JUDGE DEEMS REFERRAL APPROPRIATE, A SEPARATEREFERRAL ORDER, SPECIFYING THE REASON FOR REFERRAL, WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DISTRICT COURT JUDGE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/24/2024. 7/24/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
State Court Record - Attachment
Tue 07/23 2:01 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, ) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/19 4:16 PM
NOTICE by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. re1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), (STRINGHAM, JOHN) |
|
3 | 3
adr
Letter re: Arbitration Certification
Fri 07/19 3:56 PM
Letter re: Arbitration Certification(sbt) |
|
Att: 1 Arbitration Certification Form | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Fri 07/19 3:26 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Home Depot, Inc. by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC..(STRINGHAM, JOHN) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Attorney)
Fri 07/19 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17614078), filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC..(STRINGHAM, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Case Management Form, | ||
Att: 5 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 6 Disclosure of Citizenship | ||
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Fri 07/19 3:57 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Civil Box is not checked off. (sbt) |