Alternative Logistics, LLC
New Hampshire Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kimberly Bacher |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10503 |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Alternative Logistics, LLC
1 Chestnut St Ste 222
Nashua, NH 03060-9306 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
James C. Cleveland Building 53 Pleasant Street Suite 2300
Concord, NH 03301 |
Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
order
Continue/Schedule Hearing
Thu 09/05 10:20 AM
Order Continuing Hearing Signed on 9/5/2024 Status hearing to be held on 10/30/2024 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom A. (So ordered by Judge Kimberly Bacher )(cgg) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
trustee
341 Meeting of Creditors Held (ALL CHAPTERS - TRUSTEE/US TRUSTEE USE ONLY)
Thu 08/22 10:55 AM
341 Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded. Debtor(s) sworn. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee (Dirsa, Ann) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Pre-Status Conference Report (CH.11 - Subchapter V ONLY)
Mon 08/19 2:54 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Debtor Alternative Logistics, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (BK)
Thu 08/15 2:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by J. Daniel Marr Filed by Creditor One Chestnut Realty, LLC (Marr, J.) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Operating Report
Thu 08/15 11:33 AM
Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 19 - 31, 2024 Filed by Debtor Alternative Logistics, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit July 2024 Balance Sheet | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit July 2024 Profit & Loss | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit St. Mary's Bank July 2024 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit TD Bank - July 2024 statement | ||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)
Thu 08/15 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (AP)
Wed 08/14 10:36 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by J. Daniel Marr Filed by Debtor Alternative Logistics, LLC (Marr, J.) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Document
Tue 08/13 4:48 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Document. Hearing set for 08/14/2024 is canceled. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee (Dirsa, Ann) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
order
Employ
Mon 08/12 4:55 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Eleanor Wm. Dahar, Esq. of Victor W. Dahar, P.A. Signed on 8/12/2024. (So ordered by Judge Kimberly Bacher ) (jel) |
|
28 | 28
court
Reassignment of Case to Judge Kimberly Bacher (ADI)
Mon 08/12 2:01 PM
Reassignment of Case to Judge Kimberly Bacher. This reassignment is for internal purposes only and does not change the general reference of all bankruptcy cases by the U.S. District Court to the bankruptcy judges. Any hearing currently scheduled may be rescheduled. A separate notice will be issued if the hearing is rescheduled. Any papers filed in this matter shall display the initials KB after the case number and proposed orders should be drafted for Judge Bachers' signature. (kamadmin) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)
Sat 08/10 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 14. Notice Date 08/09/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
order
Continue/Schedule Hearing
Wed 08/07 12:45 PM
Order Continuing Hearing Signed on 8/7/2024 Hearing scheduled for 8/14/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom A. (So ordered by Judge Bruce A. Harwood )(pptak) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
answer
Objection
Mon 08/05 10:27 AM
Objection Filed by Debtor Alternative Logistics, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)
Sat 08/03 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 14. Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
5
pgs
motion
Employ
Fri 08/02 11:25 AM
Ex Parte Application to Employ Eleanor Wm. Dahar of Victor W. Dahar, P.A. as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Alternative Logistics, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Rule 2014(a) Statement of Eleanor Wm. Dahar | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
22 | 22
misc
Declaration About Debtor Schedules - Form 106DEC
Fri 08/02 11:21 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Declaration About Debtors Schedules. , Equity Security Holders , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G , Schedule H , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Alternative Logistics, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Wed 07/31 4:55 PM
Notice of Hearing with Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee (Dirsa, Ann) |
|
20 | 20
order
Expedite Hearing
Wed 07/31 3:34 PM
Order Granting Motion Expedite Hearing. Objections or Responses, if any, to the United States Trustees Motion shall be Filed no later than August 5, 2024. Signed on 7/31/2024. Hearing scheduled for 8/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom A. (So ordered by Judge Bruce A. Harwood ) (pptak) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Expedite Hearing (BK)
Wed 07/31 10:28 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee (Dirsa, Ann) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 07/31 10:23 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Maintain Appropriate Insurance Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee (Dirsa, Ann) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors (ADI)
Fri 07/26 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. . No. of Notices: 15. Notice Date 07/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (ADI)
Thu 07/25 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 14. Notice Date 07/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (BK) (ADI)
Thu 07/25 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tue 07/23 1:48 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/22/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephonic Meeting of Creditors. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 10/21/2024. (jel) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
trustee
Notice/Certificate Appointing Trustee (U.S. TRUSTEE ONLY)
Tue 07/23 1:25 PM
Notice/Certificate of Appointment of Trustee in a Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Case. James S. LaMontagne added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee (Dirsa, Ann) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Affidavit | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit
Mon 07/22 2:40 PM
Affidavit of Leo White Regarding Financial Documents Required by Section 1161(1)(A) Filed by Debtor Alternative Logistics, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
10 | 10
order
Status Conference/Hearing
Mon 07/22 8:47 AM
Order Setting a Status Conference/Hearing. See order for additional deadlines. Signed on 7/22/2024 Status hearing to be held on 9/4/2024 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom A. Pre-Status Report Due By 8/21/2024. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due by 7/26/2024. Small Business Balance Sheet due by 7/26/2024. Small Business Statement of Operations due by 7/26/2024. Tax return due by 7/26/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 9/27/2024. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 10/17/2024. (So ordered by Judge Bruce A. Harwood )(cgg) |
|
trustee
341 Meeting Date Set - Chapter 11 use ONLY
Mon 07/22 10:20 AM
Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 341(a) the United States Trustee has scheduled the meeting of creditors to take place on August 22, 2024 at 10:00 AM at the following location: The meeting will be telephonic. Please call (877) 954-4464 and use passcode 6404174#. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee (Dirsa, Ann) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
Notice to File Missing Documents (CH. 11)
Mon 07/22 8:50 AM
Notice to Debtor to File Schedules and Statements. Certain schedules and statements were not filed with the voluntary petition and are required to be filed by the date indicated under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1007 and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-1. Failure to file the documents required by 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-1 will result in the issuing of a Clerks Notice of Dismissal (Contingent). . Statement of Financial Affairs due by 8/2/2024. Schedule A/B due 8/2/2024. Schedule D due by 8/2/2024. Schedule E/F due 8/2/2024. Schedule G due by 8/2/2024. Schedule H due by 8/2/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 8/2/2024. Declaration re Debtor Schedules due by 8/2/2024. Atty Disclosure Statement due by 8/2/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due by 8/2/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 8/2/2024. (cgg) |
|
9 | 9
court
Case Assigned
Fri 07/19 4:20 PM
Judge Bruce A. Harwood assigned to case. (cgg) |
|
8 | 8
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Receipt for Fees Paid via Credit/Debit Card (ADI)
Fri 07/19 3:54 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11([LINK 24-10503 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A4232644, Fee amount $1738.00. . (U.S. Treasury) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Small Business Balance Sheet
Fri 07/19 3:53 PM
Small Business Balance Sheet Filed by Debtor Alternative Logistics, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Small Business Statement of Operations
Fri 07/19 3:51 PM
Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Debtor Alternative Logistics, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Small Business Cash Flow Statement
Fri 07/19 3:50 PM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by Debtor Alternative Logistics, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Tax Documents
Fri 07/19 3:49 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2022 Filed by Debtor Alternative Logistics, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Debtor Organizational Documents
Fri 07/19 3:46 PM
Debtor Organizational Documents Filed by Debtor Alternative Logistics, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Resolution
Fri 07/19 3:44 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Alternative Logistics, LLC (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (CH. 11) (ACTIVE EVENT)
Fri 07/19 3:42 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Alternative Logistics, LLC Incomplete Filings due by 08/2/2024. (Dahar, Eleanor) |
|
utility
Update Government Proof of Claim
Fri 07/19 4:21 PM
Government Proof of Claim Deadline set. Government Proof of Claim due by 1/15/2025. (cgg) |