Smith v. Douglas et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jerry Edwards, Jr |
Referred: | Kayla D Mcclusky |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00971 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Sec P - Order Amend/ARP/Summons/Timely
Tue 08/27 4:49 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend Complaint within 30 days of the filing of this Order to cure the deficiencies outlined. Plaintiff shall dismiss any claims that he is unable to cure through amendment. Plaintiff shall also notify the Court of any change in his address. Pro Se Response due by 9/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/27/2024. (crt,Leday, A) |
|
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Tue 08/27 4:40 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 1 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/27/2024. (crt,Leday, A) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 08/21 1:52 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 8/20/2024. (crt,Taylor, L) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 08/14 11:23 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derrick Dwayne Smith. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/12/2024.(crt,Haik, K) (Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Att: 3 (8/14/2024) Proposed order | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Sec P - Deficiency Order
Fri 07/26 11:23 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. (Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 8/26/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/26/2024.(crt,Miletello, A) |
|
Att: 1 In Forma Pauperis form | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Thu 07/25 2:05 PM
PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/25/2024. (crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/19 3:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Derrick Dwayne Smith. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/19/2024.(crt,Williams, G) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Quentin Douglas, Ethan Ellis, Kevin Herrington, Don Taylor filed by Derrick Dwayne Smith.(crt,Williams, G) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 07/19 3:34 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture motion relief requested within pdf of Doc 1 Complaint. by Derrick Dwayne Smith. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/19/2024. (crt,Williams, G) Modified to assign document number on 7/19/2024 (Williams, G) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/25 11:05 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Devillier, W) |