Tarpley v. CITY OF MEMPHIS et al
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | Mark S Norris |
Referred: | Annie T Christoff |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02513 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 3:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
CITY OF MEMPHIS
125 N. MAIN ST.
MEMPHIS, TN 38103 |
|
Defendant
City of Memphis Division of Public Works
|
|
Defendant
W. Lewis
|
|
Defendant
Memphis Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Shelby County General Sessions Court Clerk
|
|
Plaintiff
Harold Tarpley
1985 South Parkway East
Memphis, TN 38114 |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 09/10 4:29 PM
Summons Issued as to CITY OF MEMPHIS, City of Memphis Division of Public Works, W. Lewis, Memphis Police Department, Shelby County General Sessions Court Clerk. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mlk) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/22 8:10 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice LR 16.2
Mon 07/22 8:10 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) |
|
5 | 5
notice
ADR Compliance
Mon 07/22 8:09 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/22 8:05 AM
Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Attachment
Mon 07/22 7:51 AM
ATTACHMENT - table of contents and exhibits part 1 to2 Pro Se Complaint, by Harold Tarpley..(jae) |
|
Att: 1 exhibits part 2, | ||
Att: 2 exhibits part 3, | ||
Att: 3 exhibits part 4 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Pro Se Complaint
Mon 07/22 7:48 AM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against CITY OF MEMPHIS, City of Memphis Division of Public Works, W. Lewis, Memphis Police Department, Shelby County General Sessions Court Clerk, filed by Harold Tarpley.(jae) |
|
Att: 1 complaint part 2, | ||
Att: 2 complaint part 3, | ||
Att: 3 complaint part 4, | ||
Att: 4 complaint part 5, | ||
Att: 5 complaint part 6, | ||
Att: 6 complaint part 7, | ||
Att: 7 agreement to receive NEFs | ||
1 | 1
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 07/19 4:18 PM
Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number 200004493 (mlk) |