Valle v. USA
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Marcia A Crone |
Referred: | Zack Hawthorn |
Case #: | 9:24-cv-00134 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate/Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/19 11:52 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. All motions by either party not previously ruled on are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/16/24. (ljw) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Withdraw
Thu 08/15 1:46 PM
PRO SE MOTION to Withdraw1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Martin Valle. (KMH) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 07/31 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Gaston on behalf of USA (Gaston, Lauren) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Report and Recommendations
Thu 07/25 11:28 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Martin Valle. The motion should be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/24/24. (ljw) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Mon 07/22 9:52 AM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Martin Valle.(KMH) |
|
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/22 9:53 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (KMH) |