Chavez v. Kubi Homes LLC et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Susan M Brnovich |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01779 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 1:39 AM MST |
Defendant
Kubi Homes LLC
|
|
Defendant
Kubi Marketing Company
|
|
Plaintiff
James Chavez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 09/04 7:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, (Doc.12 ), Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action
Tue 09/03 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Chavez. (Giribaldo, Bryan) |
|
11 | 11
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Tue 09/03 7:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER: MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 24-1779 PHX-SMB. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for September 9, 2024 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Monday, September 02, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Tue 09/03 7:15 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 08/22 10:23 AM
ORDER - Plaintiff shall file a status report on or before 9/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 8/22/24. (DXD) |
|
7 | 7
misc
25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))
Thu 08/22 7:22 AM
ORDER that James Chavez show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/9/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Service Executed
Wed 07/24 7:01 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by James Chavez: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet upon Kubi Marketing Co. on 7/23/2024. (Giribaldo, Bryan) |
|
5 | 5
service
Service Executed
Wed 07/24 6:59 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by James Chavez: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet upon Kubi Homes, LLC on 7/23/2024. (Giribaldo, Bryan) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion
Mon 07/22 8:54 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Bryan A Giribaldo on behalf of Plaintiff James Chavez. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 2:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Kubi Homes LLC, Kubi Marketing Company.(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 07/19 2:36 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23264951. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01779 PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached.(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 07/19 2:35 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by James Chavez. (submitted by Bryan Giribaldo)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 2:34 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23264951 filed by James Chavez. (submitted by Bryan Giribaldo)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |