Bradford et al v. Monsanto Company et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04391 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | San Francisco Superior Court, CGC24612604 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 2:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Norcal Ace Retailer Group, Inc. dba Pacific Ace Hardware
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wilbur Ellis Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wilbur Ellis Nutrition LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carl Bradford, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaime Hutchinson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case
Tue 08/27 8:27 AM
DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2741 opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-04391-VC Bradford et al v. Monsanto Company et al cc: JPMDL (ecg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/21 10:31 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carl Bradford, III, Jaime Hutchinson.. (Raggio, John) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 08/21 10:29 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by The Clerk on 08/21/2024.(kxo, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 08/21 9:50 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/21 8:02 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Monsanto Company.. (Killian, Ryan) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 07/19 2:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company, Norcal Ace Retailer Group, Inc. dba Pacific Ace Hardware, Wilbur Ellis Company, Wilbur Ellis Nutrition LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. re2 Civil Cover Sheet,1 Notice of Removal,, (Killian, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 07/19 2:36 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Monsanto Company, Norcal Ace Retailer Group, Inc. dba Pacific Ace Hardware, Wilbur Ellis Company, Wilbur Ellis Nutrition LLC . (Killian, Ryan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/19 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-24-612604. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19640100). Filed by Norcal Ace Retailer Group, Inc. dba Pacific Ace Hardware, Wilbur Ellis Company, Monsanto Company, Wilbur Ellis Nutrition LLC.(Killian, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Court Case File, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Declaration Gina Taylor, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Declaration Burnett, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Declaration Gould, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 Declaration Garrett, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 Declaration Schulein |