Alam v. Mayorkas et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Rita F Lin |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04393 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
|
Defendant
Danielle E. Lehman
|
|
Defendant
USCIS
|
|
Plaintiff
Junaid Alam
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 08/05 7:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Junaid Alam (Wiley, Joye) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 07/24 1:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 07/23 11:04 AM
Proposed Summons. (Wiley, Joye) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 07/23 9:46 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***For the Proposed Summons, there are defendants listed on this filing who are not named within the Complaint. This filing will not be processed by the Clerk's Office. Please amend and re-file the Proposed Summons in its entirety.*** Re:4 Proposed Summons filed by Junaid Alam (krp, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 07/22 1:54 PM
Proposed Summons. (Wiley, Joye) |
|
3 | 3
order
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order
Mon 07/22 12:03 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 07/19 2:59 PM
Case assigned to Judge Rita F. Lin. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Junaid Alam ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19640170.). Filed by Junaid Alam.(Wiley, Joye) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet |