50 Exchange Terrace, LLC v. Mount Vernon Specialty Insurance Company et al
Rhode Island District Court | |
Judge: | Mary S Mcelroy |
Referred: | Patricia A Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00285 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Providence Superior Court, PC-24-02508 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 4:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
|
|
Defendant
Mount Vernon Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
50 Exchange Terrace, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 08/30 1:58 PM
RESPONSE In Opposition to6 MOTION to Stay re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Mount Vernon Specialty Insurance Company. Replies due by 9/6/2024. (Sasa, Jordan) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 08/23 12:45 PM
RESPONSE In Opposition to5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mount Vernon Specialty Insurance Company. Replies due by 8/30/2024.(Sasa, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Return of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Return of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal | ||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Stay
Thu 08/22 12:07 PM
MOTION to Stay re3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by 50 Exchange Terrace, LLC. Responses due by 9/5/2024. (Casper, Kimberly) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Remand to State Court
Wed 08/14 11:51 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 50 Exchange Terrace, LLC. Responses due by 8/28/2024.(Casper, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
4 | 4
misc
State Court Record
Wed 08/14 12:38 PM
STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hill, Cherelle) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Dismiss Case as Frivolous
Wed 07/31 1:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution , First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Mount Vernon Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/14/2024.(Sasa, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit The Policy, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint filed in Superior Court of California, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit California Court's Order of Dismissal, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Petition Requesting Appointment of Umpire | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)
Mon 07/22 2:34 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal - New Case
Mon 07/22 12:21 PM
NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2024-02508. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ARIDC-2021250, filed by Mount Vernon Specialty Insurance Company.(Sasa, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 Underlying Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Ex A, | ||
Att: 4 Ex. B, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Action Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/22 2:34 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hill, Cherelle) |