Cavett v. Collier et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeremy D Kernodle |
Referred: | John D Love |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00256 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Fri 08/23 4:53 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Bryan Scott Cavett as to11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File. Received 8/13/2024. (ndc) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Wed 08/14 9:16 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by TDCJ Local Funds Division as to7 Order. Received 8/2/2024. (wea) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 08/08 2:54 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File, to the extent that his amended complaint is due on or before September 20, 2024. The Clerk shall accept no further filings from Plaintiff until he has filed his amended complaint as ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/8/2024. (wea) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File
Wed 08/07 4:17 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Bryan Scott Cavett. (wea) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Tue 08/06 3:01 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Bryan Scott Cavett as to7 Order,5 Order. Received 7/30/2024. (wea) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/24 1:17 PM
ORDER TO AMEND. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from receipt of this order to file an amended complaint in this Court on the standard form stating specific facts to support his claim(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/24/2024. (wea) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 07/24 1:15 PM
ORDER finding as moot3 Motion to Suspend the Copy Rule. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/24/2024. (wea) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 07/24 1:09 PM
ORDER REGARDING FILING FEE. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No partial filing fee shall be assessed. In the event that the Plaintiff subsequently receives deposits in his inmate trust account, the agency having custody of the Plaintiff shall deduct 20% of each deposit made to the Plaintiff's inmate trust account and forward payments to the Court on a regular basis provided the account exceeds $10.00 until the full $350 fee is satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/24/2024. (wea) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/19 5:00 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (wea) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/19 4:58 PM
MOTION to Suspend Copy Rule by Bryan Scott Cavett. (wea) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/19 4:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bryan Scott Cavett. (wea) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Ken Bruner, Bryan Collier, Linda C. Dauphin, Mica G. Lakin, Maria J. McEvoy, Natalia L. Seegmiller, Tammy Shelby, filed by Bryan Scott Cavett.(wea) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 5 pgs Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 2 pgs Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 2 pgs Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 2 pgs Affidavit/Declaration of Inmate Filing, | ||
Att: 12 1 pgs Envelope | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability
Fri 07/19 5:01 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . MAILED Consent to Plaintiff. (wea) |