Burch v. Ford Motor Company
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | P Casey Pitts |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-04395 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Santa Clara County Superior Court, 24CV441224 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Future Ford, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Burch
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Fri 08/30 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Future Ford, Inc. (Hugret, Spencer) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Fri 08/30 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Katherine Pollard Vilchez on behalf of Future Ford, Inc. (Vilchez, Katherine) |
|
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 08/30 11:04 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Future Ford, Inc..(Clayton, Trina) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Fri 08/30 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Trina Marie Clayton on behalf of Future Ford, Inc. (Clayton, Trina) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/22 5:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Burch. Future Ford, Inc. served on 8/9/2024, answer due 8/30/2024. (Faulk, Kevin) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 08/22 5:29 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Please refile as ECF Event "Summons Returned Executed." Re:20 Certificate of Service filed by Jason Burch (msr, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Wed 08/21 6:02 PM
REPLY to Opposition filed byJason Burch. (Faulk, Kevin) |
|
20 | 20
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 08/21 6:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Burch re17 Summons Issued (Faulk, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Wed 08/14 3:44 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byFord Motor Company.(Clayton, Trina) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Atty iso Opposition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 08/12 6:40 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Clayton, Trina) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/08 10:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Future Ford, Inc.. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 08/07 4:47 PM
Proposed Summons. (Faulk, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/01 1:25 PM
ORDER re 14 MOTION to Remand filed by Jason Burch Plaintiff noticed his motion to remand 14 for Wednesday, September 11, at 11:00am. As set forth in the Courts Standing Order for Civil Cases and Scheduling Notes, the Courts Civil Law and Motion calendar takes place on Thursday at 10:00am. Accordingly, the Court will reset the hearing on plaintiffs motion to Thursday, October 10, at 10:00am. The Court reminds counsel to review the Courts Standing Order and ensure that all future filing comply with its provisions. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge P. Casey Pitts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sfb, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Remand
Wed 07/31 11:11 AM
MOTION to Remand filed by Jason Burch. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2024 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge P. Casey Pitts. Responses due by 8/14/2024. Replies due by 8/21/2024. (Faulk, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/30 3:36 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2024 at 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/29 5:49 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Jason Burch. (Faulk, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/25 9:18 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2024 at 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/24 8:31 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge P. Casey Pitts for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, except for discovery purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 07/23 4:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/23 2:29 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company..(Clayton, Trina) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 07/22 1:08 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Telephonic Only. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 07/22 9:49 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2024. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
respoth
Answer to Removal Complaint
Mon 07/22 1:03 PM
Answer to Removal Complaint (see Removal1 Exhibit G) by Ford Motor Company. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/19 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/19 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Pollard Vilchez(Vilchez, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/19 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Trina Marie Clayton(Clayton, Trina) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 07/19 3:50 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation (parent of State Street Bank and Trust Company, which is the trustee of the Ford defined contribution plans), Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A. (fiduciary of the Ford defined contribution plans) for Ford Motor Company.(Clayton, Trina) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/19 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV441224. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19640676). Filed by Ford Motor Company.(Clayton, Trina) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Atty iso Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 12 Certificate/Proof of Service |