United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee v. Prime Hydration, LLC
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Maritza Dominguez Braswel |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02001 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 2:45 AM MDT |
Defendant
Prime Hydration, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond
Thu 09/12 8:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting the15 Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to File Response to Complaint. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to September 26, 2024. The deadline to file a proposed scheduling order and consent form is extended to September 30, 2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 9/12/2024. Text Only Entry(mdblc1) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
Wed 09/11 5:52 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint,8 Order Unopposed by Defendant Prime Hydration, LLC. (Barr, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Report re: Patent/Trademark
Thu 08/08 12:48 PM
Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jrobe, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond
Tue 08/06 1:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting the12 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to File Response to Complaint. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the1 Complaint is extended to September 12, 2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 8/6/2024. Text Only Entry(mdblc1) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
Tue 08/06 1:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint, by Defendant Prime Hydration, LLC. (Barr, Andrew) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/06 1:11 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Drink Prime Holding Company LLC for Prime Hydration, LLC. (Barr, Andrew) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Tue 08/06 1:00 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Daniel Barr on behalf of Prime Hydration, LLCAttorney Andrew Daniel Barr added to party Prime Hydration, LLC(pty:dft) (Barr, Andrew) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Tue 08/06 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Herbert H. Finn on behalf of Prime Hydration, LLCAttorney Herbert H. Finn added to party Prime Hydration, LLC(pty:dft) (Finn, Herbert) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
4
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/29 1:28 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 9/16/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/16/2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 7/29/2024. (evaug) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/23 11:23 AM
NOTICE Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Plaintiff United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee (Beard, James) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 9:23 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (blaws) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Mon 07/22 9:21 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Administrative Notice
Mon 07/22 9:20 AM
Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Patent, Trademark, or Copyright Action case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party commencing the action to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.1. Please file a properly completed Report form, which can be found on the court's website. (blaws) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/19 4:22 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Beard, James) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Summons Request
Fri 07/19 4:20 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Prime Hydration LLC by Plaintiff United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee. (Beard, James) |
|
1 | 1
29
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 4:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Prime Hydration, LLC (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9783677)Attorney James Warren Beard added to party United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee(pty:pla), filed by United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee.(Beard, James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |