Branch v. Albertson's LLC
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Maximiliano D Couvillier, III |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01327 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Eighth Judicial District, A-24-894004-C |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 2:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Albertson's LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Shirelle Branch
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response
Fri 08/30 4:26 PM
RESPONSE to8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Albertson's LLC. Replies due by 9/6/2024. (Burden, Jack) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
order
Standing Order
Wed 08/28 10:45 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. Judge Couvillier's Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice Attorney Action Required
Mon 08/26 7:24 AM
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to10 Notice of Appearance. Attorney Danielle A. Tarmu advised to review and comply with LR IC 2-1(g) and update your user information account in Pacer/CMECF. (no image attached) (WJ) |
||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Fri 08/23 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William A Gonzales on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa Shirelle Branch. (Gonzales, William) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/20 11:20 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lisa Shirelle Branch. (Gonzales, William) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Motion Remand to State Court
Fri 08/16 2:50 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Lisa Shirelle Branch. Responses due by 8/30/2024.(Gonzales, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Thu 07/25 4:50 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Albertson's LLC. (Burden, Jack) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Thu 07/25 2:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Albertson's LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Albertson's Safeway LLC (DE; ID), Corporate Parent Albertson's Holdings LLC (DE; ID), Corporate Parent AB Acquisition LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Albertson's Companies, Inc. (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Albertson's LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate ABS NV-O, LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Safeway Inc. (DE; CA), Other Affiliate Albertson's Stores Sub LLC (DE; ID), Other Affiliate Albertson's Stores Sub Holdings LLC (DE; ID) for Albertson's LLC added. (Burden, Jack) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice Other
Thu 07/25 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Minutes of the Court dated July 22, 2024 by Albertson's LLC re3 Minute Order Removal Case,. (Burden, Jack) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
order
Standing Order
Tue 07/23 6:56 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
minord
Minute Order Removal Case
Mon 07/22 4:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/22/2024. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/6/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/21/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
notice
Notice Attorney Action Required
Mon 07/22 8:17 AM
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to1 Petition for Removal. Attorney Jamie Clark advised to review and comply with LR IA 11-1 and LR IC 2-1. (no image attached) (WJ) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition Removal
Fri 07/19 4:05 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-24-894004-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7751893) by Albertson's LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/29/2024. (Burden, Jack) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Index Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 07/22 4:55 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (ALZ) |