Dinaali v. Luna et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Elayna J Youchah |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01329 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 2:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Interlaced Social LLC
|
|
Defendant
Robert G. Luna
|
|
Defendant
Prospera Law LLP
|
|
Defendant
Shirley N. Webber
|
|
Plaintiff
Aladdin Dinaali
4200 Paradise Rd., Apt 2028
Las Vegas, NV 89169 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Report and Recommendation ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 09/05 10:25 AM
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT the Report and Recommendation [ECF No.5 ] is ADOPTED; plaintiff's claims against Sheriff Luna and California Secretary of State Webber in their official capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate these defendants from this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/4/2024. Robert G. Luna and Shirley N. Webber terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Report and Recommendation Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines)
Tue 08/20 4:33 PM
ORDER. Based on the foregoing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Aladdin Dinaali's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No.1 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice but with leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff chooses to amend her Complaint, she must do so no later than September 6, 2024. Plaintiff's amended complaint must allege facts establishing subject matter jurisdiction over her claims and personal jurisdiction over the defendants she seeks to sue. Plaintiff must also clearly identify what claims she seeks to bring against each defendant based on facts that tie a defendant to the alleged wrongdoing.Plaintiff's amended complaint must be complete in and of itself. It must contain all the facts on which she bases her claims and must identify the constitutional wrongs engaged in by the defendants identified. The Court cannot refer to Plaintiff's original Complaint when it screens her amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's failure to comply with the terms of this Order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Use and Register for Electronic Case filing (ECF No. 4 ) is DENIED without prejudice as premature. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's claims asserted against Sheriff Luna and California Secretary of State Webber in their official capacities be dismissed with prejudice as barred by the Eleventh Amendment to the U.S. Constitution. Objections to R&R due by 9/2/2024. Amended Complaint deadline: 9/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/19/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically
Mon 07/22 3:58 PM
MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically by Plaintiff Aladdin Dinaali. Responses due by 8/5/2024. (RJDG) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Mon 07/22 11:18 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (RJDG) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Consent for Electronic Service of Documents
Mon 07/22 10:59 AM
Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Aladdin Dinaali. (RJDG) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/22 10:57 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Aladdin Dinaali.(RJDG) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 07/19 3:56 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (AMMi) |