Smith v. Marksman Security Corporation
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Maximiliano D Couvillier, III |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01328 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 2:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Marksman Security Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Smith
Hatfield & Associates, Ltd. 703 S. 8th St.
Las Vegas, NV 89102 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice to Clerk re Assignment to MJ
Thu 08/29 4:11 PM
NOTICE to Clerk of Court regarding assignment of case to Magistrate Judge. (The attached document is restricted to the Office of the Clerk and is not viewable. The filer of this document is also restricted. See General Orders 2023-11 and 2023-12.) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
order
Standing Order
Wed 08/28 10:45 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. Judge Couvillier's Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) |
||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 07/29 5:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jonathan Smith. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hatfield, Trevor) |
|
misc
QC Notice
Mon 07/29 6:28 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Jonathan Smith. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/5/2024. (no image attached) (WJ) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 9:21 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marksman Security Corporation re1 Complaint. (AMMi) |
|
notice
ENE Notice
Mon 07/22 9:20 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. No ENE will be conducted in cases subject to arbitration. Parties to cases subject to mandatory arbitration, as well as parties who agree to arbitrate, must notify the Court of the same no later than 14 days after the date of this Notice. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (no image attached) (AMMi) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Marksman Security Corporation (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7751914) by Jonathan Smith. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/29/2024. Proof of service due by 10/17/2024. (Hatfield, Trevor) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 07/22 9:19 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (AMMi) |