West v. Aggressor Adventures LLC
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Ann Marie Mciff Allen |
Referred: | Jared C Bennett |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00123 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 3:00 AM MDT |
Defendant
Aggressor Adventures LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer West
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Fri 09/06 4:47 PM
First AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Raymond Mercola in Opposition re10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jennifer West.(Mercola, Raymond) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 08/13 5:07 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Aggressor Adventures LLC. Attorney Taylor H. Allin added to party Aggressor Adventures LLC(pty:dft)(Allin, Taylor) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/07 4:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer West. Summons served on Aggressor Adventures LLC, on 07/30/2024.(Mercola, Raymond) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/07 3:44 PM
STRICKEN CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jennifer West Sheriff's Entry of Service-Richmond County, Georgia (Mercola, Raymond) Modified by striking event per ECF 8 on 8/7/2024 (mh) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 08/07 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re7 Certificate of Service : The clerk requests the filer of the original document to refile under the correct event, Summons Returned Executed. Event found under Civil-Initial Pleadings and Service- Service of Process-Summons Returned Executed. The new pleadings will receive a new document numbers on the docket.7 Certificate of Service stricken from the docket. (mh) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
5
pgs
order
Order to Propose Schedule
Tue 07/23 11:03 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 7/23/2024. (haa) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Tue 07/23 8:16 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Aggressor Adventures LLC. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec) |
|
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/23 9:04 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen on 7/23/24. (pjd) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request Summons
Mon 07/22 4:09 PM
Requested Summons as to Jennifer West. (Mercola, Raymond) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Mon 07/22 8:12 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jennifer West. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 8/12/2024. (kec) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/22 8:12 AM
Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen added. Case number will now read 1:24-cv-00123-AMA. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Atty)
Fri 07/19 4:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Aggressor Adventures LLC (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5130343) filed by Jennifer West. (Mercola, Raymond) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |