Yazzie v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01787 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion
Wed 07/31 3:16 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Rory J Linerud on behalf of Plaintiff Tyrell Yazzie. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Mon 07/29 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund Jack Darcher on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice - SS Action Commenced
Mon 07/22 10:06 AM
NOTICE: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summons shall issue. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KLG) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/22 10:05 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Within [thirty (30)] days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief addressing why the Commissioner's decision is not supported by substantial evidence or why the decision should otherwise be reversed or the case remanded. Defendant must file an answering brief within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within [fourteen (14)] days after service of Defendant's brief. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/22/2024. (KLG) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/22 10:03 AM
ORDER that the Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs2 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/22/2024. (KLG) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 07/19 5:14 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01787 PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/19 5:13 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tyrell Yazzie. (submitted by Rory Linerud) (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 5:12 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Tyrell Yazzie. (submitted by Rory Linerud)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |