Paredes v. Frost-Arnett Company
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen M Mcnamee |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01788 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 1:40 AM MST |
Defendant
Frost-Arnett Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nefi Paredes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Disclosure Statement
Tue 09/03 7:34 PM
Disclosure Statement by Frost-Arnett Company. (Starr, Lynnsee) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/03 7:32 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Frost-Arnett Company.(Starr, Lynnsee) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 08/22 9:19 AM
ORDER approving the7 First Stipulation for Extension of Time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED allowing Defendant up to and including September 3, 2024 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 8/21/2024. (ESG) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 08/20 11:10 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Frost-Arnett Company.(Starr, Lynnsee) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Email/Firm Name (Attorney)
Fri 08/02 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/EMAIL/FIRM NAME by Landon T Maxwell. (Maxwell, Landon) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Service Executed
Tue 07/30 12:24 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Nefi Paredes: Proof of Service re: Complaint upon Frost-Arnett Company on 7/30/2024. (Maxwell, Landon) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 5:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Frost-Arnett Company. (REK) |
|
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 07/19 5:45 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23266489. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Stephen M McNamee. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01788 PHX-SMM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 07/19 5:45 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Nefi Paredes. (submitted by Landon Maxwell) (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 5:44 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23266489 filed by Nefi Paredes. (submitted by Landon Maxwell)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |