Thi Le et al v. Bowman et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Victoria M Calvert |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03165 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
40 A&M Logistics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ABC Corp. 1-3
|
|
Defendant
Elston Mack Bowman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Does 1-5
|
|
Plaintiff
Tri Duc Nguyen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vy Thuong Thi Le
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Terminated: 08/28/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
discov
Certificate of Service
Thu 09/05 4:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery to Defendants by Tri Duc Nguyen, Vy Thuong Thi Le.(Summer, Georgia) |
|
12 | 12
discov
Certificate of Service
Thu 09/05 3:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 40 A&M Logistics' 1st Rogs and RPD to Plaintiffs by 40 A&M Logistics, LLC.(Sessions, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
discov
Initial Disclosures
Tue 09/03 1:39 PM
Initial Disclosures by Tri Duc Nguyen, Vy Thuong Thi Le.(Summer, Georgia) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 08/28 3:14 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by 40 A&M Logistics, LLC, Elston Mack Bowman.(Sessions, Matthew) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 08/28 11:59 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Dismiss. OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc. is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. The style of the case shall reflect the above changes. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 8/28/2024. (jbu) |
|
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Wed 08/28 11:56 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The discovery period shall be for SIX MONTHS, beginning August 24, 2024, and ending on February 24, 2025. Any Dispositive Motions shall be filed on or before March 24, 2025, or, in the event no Dispositive Motions are filed, a proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order shall be submitted to the Court by that same date. In the event Dispositive Motions are filed, the Consolidated Pretrial Order shall be submitted within 30 days of any ruling denying same. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 8/28/2024. (jbu) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
30+
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/27 3:04 PM
STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 8/27/24. (vs) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
Mon 08/26 2:23 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by 40 A&M Logistics, LLC, Elston Mack Bowman, OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc.. (Sessions, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Thu 08/15 10:56 AM
Consent MOTION to Dismiss Defendant OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc. by 40 A&M Logistics, LLC, Elston Mack Bowman, OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc.. (Sessions, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 08/14 5:05 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Vy Thuong Thi Le.(Summer, Georgia) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/08 3:24 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by 40 A&M Logistics, LLC, Elston Mack Bowman, OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc. for OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc.. (Sessions, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Thu 07/25 2:46 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by 40 A&M Logistics, LLC, Elston Mack Bowman, OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc.. Discovery ends on 12/23/2024.(Sessions, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/19 10:32 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by 40 A&M Logistics, LLC, OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc., Elston Mack Bowman. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13582239)(dgr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 State Court Filings with State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |