Rowe v. Theard et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas W Thrash, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03166 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
NFI Interactive Logistics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Freight, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angelo Theard
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
American International Group, Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
Nation Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg, P.A.
|
|
Plaintiff
Tyneria Rowe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/08 12:38 PM
ORDER. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE the case. The parties shall execute the settlement documents and file the dismissal consistent with their Notice of Settlement [Doc.9 ]. All deadlines in this action are STAYED pending the filing of dismissal documents. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/08/2024. (bmr) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 08/08 12:40 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (bmr) |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 08/07 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Tyneria Rowe (Yarbrough, Walter) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
Tue 08/06 4:32 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by NFI Interactive Logistics, LLC, National Freight, Inc., Angelo Theard. (Gilson, James) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/06 1:00 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by NFI Interactive Logistics, LLC, National Freight, Inc., Angelo Theard. (Gilson, James) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/30 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Walter B. Yarbrough on behalf of Tyneria Rowe (Yarbrough, Walter) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 07/19 9:33 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by National Freight, Inc. (bmr) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 07/19 9:32 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by National Freight, Inc. (Originally filed in State Court on 5/13/2024)(bmr) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 07/19 9:31 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NFI Interactive Logistics, LLC. (bmr) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 07/19 9:30 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by NFI Interactive Logistics, LLC. (Originally filed in State Court on 5/13/2024) Discovery ends on 12/16/2024.(bmr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/19 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by National Freight, Inc., Angelo Theard, NFI Interactive Logistics, LLC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13582200)(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |