Chandler v. Taylor
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Eleanor L Ross |
Referred: | J Elizabeth Mcbath |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03169 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 26, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 08/26 4:16 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action without prejudice. (ajw) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Final Report and Recommendation
Mon 08/26 3:19 PM
ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the R&R as the opinion of this Court. Doc.4 . For the reasons stated in the R&R, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Jakale Errion Chandler's Complaint Doc.1 and DENIES a certificate of appealability. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 08/26/2024. (ajw) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 08/26 4:18 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jakale Errion Chandler re8 Clerk's Judgment and7 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (ajw) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 08/26 4:19 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ajw) |
||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Fri 08/23 2:37 PM
Letter from Jakale Chandler Filed per 8/23/24 Order entered in 1:24-cv-3606-ELR (ajw) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Tue 08/20 4:26 PM
Submission of4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint filed by Jakale Errion Chandler to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Wed 07/31 3:20 PM
ORDER for Service of4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 07/31/2024. (ajw) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendation - Final
Wed 07/31 3:19 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending1 Complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE based on Plaintiff's abuse of the judicial process. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 07/31/2024. (ajw) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 07/31 3:22 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jakale Errion Chandler re4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ajw) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order ruling on IFP
Tue 07/30 2:10 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis Doc.2 is GRANTED. Plaintiff must pay the full statutory filing fee of $350.00 as funds are deposited in his inmate account pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). Specifically, the balance of the filing fee shall be paid by, or on behalf of Plaintiff, in monthly or other incremental payments in the amount of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's inmate account, in each month in which his account balance exceeds $10.00. The institution administering Plaintiff's inmate account shall withdraw such amounts from the account and remit the same to the Clerk until the filing fee is paid in full, as verified by separate notice from the Clerk to the Warden of the institution. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transmit a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Gwinnett County Jail in Lawrenceville, Georgia. The Warden, or his designee, shall collect monthly payments for this case from Plaintiff's inmate account and remit them to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Service of process shall not issue pending the Courts further consideration of this action under 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 7/30/2024. (ajw) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 07/30 2:26 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jakale Errion Chandler and Warden of Gwinnett County Jail-Kebo Taylor re3 Order (ajw) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/19 9:53 AM
Submission of2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (bmr) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account
Fri 07/19 9:52 AM
Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Jakale Errion Chandler. (bmr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 9:51 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Jakale Errion Chandler.(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Request for Form, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |