McCoy v. Bish Express Inc et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00135 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 5:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Accelerant National Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant
Bish Express Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mohamed Ramadan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Makayla McCoy
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
American Inter-Fidelity Exchange
Terminated: 07/24/2024
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice
Wed 07/24 10:27 AM
Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 7/24/2024. (dmb) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 07/24 10:05 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Dismiss terminating American Inter-Fidelity Exchange. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 7/24/2024. (dmb) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 07/22 8:48 AM
NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit A by Bish Express Inc re1 Notice of Removal, (Crowl-Parrish, Gillian) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss
Fri 07/19 4:08 PM
JOINT MOTION to Dismiss less than all Defendants without prejudiceby American Inter-Fidelity Exchange. (jkb) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/19 4:06 PM
ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Bish Express Inc, Mohamed Ramadan, United Specialty Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 12/16/2024.(jkb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 07/19 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Bish Express Inc. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13583186)(jkb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |