Alexander v. Renner et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Hala Y Jarbou |
Referred: | Ray Kent |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00740 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:46 AM EDT |
defendant
Scott Andrew Renner
|
|
defendant
Velo Associates PLC
|
|
plaintiff
David Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 09/05 9:38 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Scott Andrew Renner served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024; Velo Associates PLC served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024 (Warner, Curtis) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/26 12:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff David Alexander re complaint1 , Summons Issued4 , Order on Motion for Alternate Service8 (Warner, Curtis) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Alternate Service
Fri 08/23 3:09 PM
ORDER granting5 motion for alternate service; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence
Thu 08/22 7:05 PM
CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for alternate service and Memorandum in Support, (Ex-Parte Motion) 5 filed by David Alexander (Warner, Curtis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Email exchange between counsel | ||
6 | 6
respm
Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count
Thu 08/22 7:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION for alternate service and Memorandum in Support, (Ex-Parte Motion) 5 filed by David Alexander (Warner, Curtis) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Alternate Service
Thu 08/22 7:03 PM
MOTION for alternate service and Memorandum in Support, (Ex-Parte Motion) by plaintiff David Alexander; (Warner, Curtis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Affidavit of Non-Service, Scott Andrew Renner, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Affidavit of Non-Service, Velo Associates PLC, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Motion and Order, Huff v. Velo Associates, PLC and Scott Renner, 19-4986 GC (34th Dist. Ct.), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D. Brief and Order, Thompson v. Scott a. Renner, 19-cv-939 (W.D. Mich.), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E. State of Michigan MiFILE address on file for Mr. Renner, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F. Scott Andrew Renner's and Velo Associates PLC's address on file with the State Bar of Michigan, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G. Velo Associates PLC, State of Michigan, Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs, identifying Cascade Agent Solutions, LLC as its Registered Agent, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H. Cascade Agent Solutions, LLC's Articles of Organization, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I. https://gis.kentcountymi.gov/public/publicviewerjs/index.html?ppn=41-14-21-101-071 (Parcel Number 41-14-21-101-071, owned by Rogue Properties LLC), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J. Rogue Properties LLC's Articles of Organization, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K. Obituary of Doris Hendrian, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L. Obituary of Audrey Ruth Renner, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M. Rogue Properties LLC, State of Michigan, Department of Licensing and Regulatory Affairs, identifying Cascade Agent Solutions, LLC as its Registered Agent | ||
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Mon 08/05 9:56 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John Evanchek on behalf of plaintiff David Alexander (Evanchek, John) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 9:03 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Scott Andrew Renner, Velo Associates PLC (ns) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Mon 07/22 9:03 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou (ns) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Proposed Summons (to be issued)
Fri 07/19 6:25 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Warner, Curtis) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 6:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Scott Andrew Renner, VELO ASSOCIATES PLC filed by Alexander David (Warner, Curtis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Fri 07/19 6:17 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Alexander David in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7433333 (Warner, Curtis) |