Lombardo v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Glenn T Suddaby |
Referred: | Miroslav Lovric |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00895 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 American Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Lowe's Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Lombardo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Letter Request
Mon 08/19 8:22 AM
TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion7 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Defendants are directed to respond to the complaint by 9/27/2024. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/19/2024. (jdc ) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Letter Request/Motion
Fri 08/16 3:40 PM
Letter Motion from Howard M. Wexler for Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC requesting thirty-days extension of time to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Wexler, Howard) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Mon 08/12 2:15 PM
***Answer due date updated for Lowe's Companies, Inc. answer due 8/28/2024. (ham) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Mon 08/12 2:15 PM
***Answer due date updated for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC answer due 8/28/2024. (ham) |
||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 08/09 12:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Docket Report, GO 25 served on Lowe's Home Centers, LLC on August 7, 2024, filed by Gary Lombardo. (Shoikhetbrod, Allen) |
|
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 08/09 12:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Docket Report, GO 25 served on Lowe's Companies, Inc. on August 7, 2024, filed by Gary Lombardo. (Shoikhetbrod, Allen) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Wed 07/24 9:40 AM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY RE:1 COMPLAINT. A redacted copy of Exhibit 1 and a redacted copy of Exhibit 2 have been uploaded and attached to1 COMPLAINT. The unredacted copy of the Exhibits are now permanently restricted pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 5.2 and NYND Local Rule 5.2. (ham) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 07/19 3:19 PM
TEXT NOTICE: The Initial Conference scheduled for 10/23/2024 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, will held via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
G.O. 25 Filing Order
Fri 07/19 2:20 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 10/23/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/16/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ham) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 2:18 PM
Summons Issued as to Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(ham) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC | ||
misc
Text Notice of Filing Deficiency
Fri 07/19 2:30 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has submitted documents that are not in compliance with redaction requirements pursuant to Federal and NYND Local Rules 5.2 Personal Privacy Protection and General Order 22, Section 11.2. This document has been TEMPORARILY RESTRICTED. Counsel is directed to make the appropriate redactions to the above referenced document and electronically file the redacted document within 3 days of this notice using the event CORRECTED DOCUMENT(S) found under Other Filings and reference this case number. Do NOT use any other event to file your corrected document. Failure to file a redacted document by the deadline will result in the unredacted document referenced above being unrestricted. Counsel and the parties are cautioned that failure to redact these personal identifiers may subject them to the Courts full disciplinary power pursuant to NYND Local Rule 5.2. Attachment 2: Exhibit 1 - Determination has the Plaintiff's home address on page 2, and needs to be redacted. Attachment 3: Exhibit 2 - Conciliation Failure and Notice of Rights has the Plaintiff's home address on pages 2 and 3, and needs to be redacted. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 7/24/2024 (ham) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 2:09 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6804339) filed by Gary Lombardo.(ham) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Determination, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Conciliation Failure and Notice of Rights, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |