Hartley v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Therese Wiley Dancks |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00893 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 08/13 2:01 PM
TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed Plaintiff's amended motion (Dkt. No.8 ) to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") which the Court accepts although it was filed one day late per the deadline set forth in Dkt. No. 6 . Upon review, Plaintiff's IFP application is approved.. **Plaintiff should note that, although the application to proceed in forma pauperis has been granted, Plaintiff will still be required to pay fees that Plaintiff incurs in this action, including copying and/or witness fees. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/13/2024. (sg ) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Amended Document - NOT Motion
Tue 08/06 5:55 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Nicholas Hartley. Amendment to 6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, . (Antonowicz, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner
Tue 07/23 5:25 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Kristina D. Cohn appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 10/21/2024. (Cohn, Kristina) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/22 3:01 PM
TEXT ORDER denying3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis of Nicholas Hartley: Court reviewed Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Dkt. No.3 ) which is denied without prejudice. The IFP application is incomplete. Question 3 must be completed to "state the amount [of money] that you received and what you expect to receive in the future" and question 5 must be completed to provide the "approximate value" of the listed items (2015 Chrysler Town & Country and house). Plaintiff must submit a completed IFP application or pay the filing fee by 8/5/2024 or the matter will be administratively closed. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 7/22/2024. (sg) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form
Fri 07/19 9:42 AM
Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12 . (jel, ) |
|
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Fri 07/19 9:46 AM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY - Renumbered documents 4 and 5 to run sequential on the docket. (jel, ) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent / Declination Form
Fri 07/19 9:43 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Nicholas Hartley advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (jel, ) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/19 9:41 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nicholas Hartley (jel, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Social Security Identification Form - [LODGED]
Fri 07/19 9:40 AM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (jel, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmpssa
Complaint - Social Security Appeal
Fri 07/19 9:40 AM
COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] .(jel, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Appeals Council Action, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Assignment of Attorney Fees, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |