|
|
misc
Remark
Thu 09/05 9:13 AM
COPY OF ORDER NO. 6 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 9/5/2024. (ahf)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 09/04 2:57 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 9/4/2024. 9/4/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (ahf)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Remark
Mon 08/05 9:19 AM
Copy of Notice Re: Pro Se Guidelines (Doc. No. 2), E-Consent (Doc. No. 3), and Order (Doc. No. 4) mailed to Plaintiff on 8/5/2024 (street name has been corrected on docket). (ahf)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
misc
Returned Mail
Mon 08/05 9:15 AM
Copy of Order/Notice dated 7/18/2024 (Document # 2) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Neyembo Mikanda, Pro se for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FORWARD. (ahf)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Remark
Tue 07/23 8:37 AM
Doc. 4, and IFP form mailed to pro se. (er)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Pro Se Civil Admin Order 5
Mon 07/22 10:14 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING FILE A COMPLAINT WITH THE COURT WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEES TO COMMENCE A CIVIL ACTION OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, PLAINTIFF MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $405 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/19/24. 7/22/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(mbh) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/22/2024) (mbh)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Remark
Fri 07/19 11:46 AM
E CONSENT NOTICE FORM MAILED TO PRO SE (rf, )
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
notice
Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
Fri 07/19 11:44 AM
PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES MAILED TO PRO SE (rf, )
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DISTRICT CLERK, filed by NEYEMBO MIKANDA. *NO FEE PAID. NO IFP*(rf, )
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit
|