Domino v. Warden
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00964 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 08/29 11:47 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/28/2024. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 08/27 11:24 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brandon R Domino. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/22/2024.(crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed order | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/27 11:14 AM
COMPLAINT against Jake Baird filed by Brandon R Domino.(crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Sec P - Deficiency Order
Fri 07/26 10:59 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms.Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 8/26/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/25/2024.(crt,Williams, K) |
|
Att: 1 1983 Civil Rights form, | ||
Att: 2 In Forma Pauperis form | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Wed 07/24 2:32 PM
PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/24/2024. (crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 9:36 AM
COMPLAINT against Warden filed by Brandon R Domino.(crt,Williams, G) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/24 2:28 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Devillier, W) |