McGraw-Williams v. Erickson et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Jerry W Blackwell |
Referred: | Leo I Brisbois |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02794 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 4:26 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bemidji Police Department, The
|
|
Defendant
Justin Allen Erickson
|
|
Defendant
Joe Kleszyk
|
|
Plaintiff
Antonio Trevyll McGraw-Williams
Sherburne County Jail 13880 Business Center Dr NW
Elk River, MN 55330 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court
Tue 08/27 12:39 PM
ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. 1. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $3.58 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order; and 2. If Plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee in the time permitted, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/27/2024.(JLB) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Response
Fri 08/09 11:55 AM
RESPONSE re3 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court filed by Antonio Trevyll McGraw-Williams.(BTX) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court
Thu 07/25 12:57 PM
ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/25/2024.(JLB) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP)
Fri 07/19 11:00 AM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Antonio Trevyll McGraw-Williams. (jam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 10:59 AM
COMPLAINT against Bemidji Police Department, The, Justin Allen Erickson, Joe Kleszyk filed by Antonio Trevyll McGraw-Williams. Case assigned to Judge Jerry W. Blackwell per 6th - Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (jam) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |