Andrews v. Carlton DO NOT DOCKET. CASE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED OUT.
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Magnuson |
Referred: | John F Docherty |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02797 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 29, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Clerk's Notice of Case Opened in Other District
Fri 08/02 12:21 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE:Case transferred from Minnesota has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 5:24-cv-00397, filed 08/02/2024. (kt) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Clerk's Notice of Case Transferred Out
Thu 08/01 1:09 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Middle District of Florida. (ABR) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 07/29 3:40 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: It IS HEREBY ORDERED that the matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida pursuant to 28 USC § 1406(a). Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 7/29/2024.(MGMM) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter from Clerk's Office re: No Fee or IFP enclosing AO 239
Fri 07/19 12:17 PM
LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Norris Deshon Andrews (jam) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 07/19 12:16 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Norris Deshon Andrews. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (jam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |