Andrews v. Carlton DO NOT DOCKET. CASE HAS BEEN TRANSFERRED OUT.
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Eric C Tostrud |
Referred: | Dulce J Foster |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02799 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 29, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Clerk's Notice of Case Opened in Other District
Fri 08/02 2:05 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: Case transferred from Minnesota has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 5:24-cv-00399, filed 08/02/2024. (CLK) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Clerk's Notice of Case Transferred Out
Fri 08/02 10:56 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Middle District of Florida. (kt) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Receipt
Thu 08/01 8:48 AM
RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000755 in the amount of $5.00 issued to Norris Andrews. (KMO) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/30 10:36 AM
ORDER Transferring Case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 7/29/2024.(RMM) Modified text on 7/30/2024 (MMG) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/24 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elise Rau on behalf of E.K. Carlton.(Rau, Kristen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter from Clerk's Office re: No Fee or IFP enclosing AO 239
Fri 07/19 12:23 PM
LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Norris Deshon Andrews (jam) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 07/19 12:22 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Norris Deshon Andrews. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. (jam) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |