HUB International Midwest Limited Inc. v. Lockton Companies, LLC et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Alistair Newbern |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00871 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 4:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
Katelyn Beach
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph M. Lacher
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lockton Companies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Logan Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HUB International Midwest Limited Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/05 1:56 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is a Notice of Dismissal (Doc No.16 ), seeking dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's claims against Defendants. Accordingly, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/5/2024. (am) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/02 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HUB International Midwest Limited Inc. (Gerth, John) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 07/24 4:13 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Mark E. Stamelos, Paige M. Lyle admitted to this court . (kc) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/23 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige M. Lyle on behalf of Katelyn Beach, Joseph M. Lacher, Lockton Companies, LLC, Logan Young (Lyle, Paige) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/23 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Stamelos on behalf of Katelyn Beach, Joseph M. Lacher, Lockton Companies, LLC, Logan Young (Stamelos, Mark) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/22 3:59 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/22/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) |
|
12 | 12
6
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Mon 07/22 11:31 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of11 MOTION to Expedite DISCOVERY AND FOR ORDER TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE filed by HUB International Midwest Limited Inc. .(Gerth, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Discovery Requests | ||
11 | 11
motion
Expedite
Mon 07/22 11:29 AM
MOTION to Expedite DISCOVERY AND FOR ORDER TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE by HUB International Midwest Limited Inc.. (Gerth, John) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 11:13 AM
Summons issued as to Katelyn Beach, Joseph M. Lacher, Lockton Companies, LLC, Logan Young. (ad) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Summons to be Issued
Fri 07/19 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Katelyn Beach. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (Gerth, John) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Summons to be Issued
Fri 07/19 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Logan Young. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (Gerth, John) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Summons to be Issued
Fri 07/19 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Joseph M. Lacher. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (Gerth, John) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Summons to be Issued
Fri 07/19 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Lockton Companies, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (Gerth, John) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Fri 07/19 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/19/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Fri 07/19 9:47 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Fri 07/19 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Fri 07/19 9:46 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Fri 07/19 9:56 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for John E. B. Gerth admitted to this court . (mg) |
||
misc
Annotation - PHV
Fri 07/19 10:24 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Marcus L. Mintz, Robyn E. Marsh: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/9/2024. (mg) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 9:44 AM
COMPLAINT against Katelyn Beach, Joseph M. Lacher, Lockton Companies, LLC, Logan Young (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4123145), filed by HUB International Midwest Limited Inc.(mg) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Business Entity Disclosure, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Lachner CNSA, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Young CNSA, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Beach CNSA, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Resignations, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Profile, | ||
Att: 7 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet |