Live Your Bliss Travel, LLC
California Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher D Jaime |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-23157 |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 27, 2024 |
Debtor
Live Your Bliss Travel, LLC
1045 Billington Ln
Roseville, CA 95747-9677 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Loris L Bakken
2715 W. Kettleman Ln. Ste 203-334
Lodi, CA 95242 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
Robert T Matsui United States Courthouse 501 I Street, Room 7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814 |
Docket last updated: 07/20/2024 12:01 AM PDT |
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
misc
EFILED RECEIPT - Voluntary Petition Fee Paid (7) [ADI]
Fri 07/19 10:00 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $338.00, Receipt Number: 391337, eFilingID: 7377503) (auto) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition 7 - Case Upload
Fri 07/19 9:51 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $338.00) (Seth L. Hanson) (eFilingID: 7377503) |
|
1 | 1
24
pgs
misc
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate DEBTOR - Including Supplemental
Fri 07/19 10:01 AM
Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor/Party See page (page #24) of Voluntary Petition (dpas) |
|
2 | 2
utility
First Meeting - 7 Business
Fri 07/19 9:55 AM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 8/27/2024 at 10:00 AM via Zoom - Bakken: Meeting ID 571 461 0376, Passcode 8713498701, Phone 1 (209) 755-7697.. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Master Address List
Fri 07/19 9:56 AM
Master Address List (auto) |
|
4 | 4
related
Declaration
Fri 07/19 10:00 AM
Declaration of Traci Buckley Re:1 Voluntary Petition (dpas) |
|
5 | 5
notice
DO NOT USE Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form)
Fri 07/19 10:02 AM
Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Loris L Bakken (auto) |