(PC) Bronson v. Dirkse
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Edmund F Brennan |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01969 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Defendant
Jeff Dirkse
|
|
Plaintiff
Caleb Bronson
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Tue 08/06 11:59 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mendez Licea, O) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Fri 07/19 9:12 AM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 8/22/2024. (Lawrence, A) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/19 9:12 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/19/2024. New Case Number 2:24-cv-01969-EFB (PC). Old Case Number 1:24-cv-00833-EPG (PC). (Lawrence, A) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 07/19 9:13 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider,3 Order served on Caleb Bronson. (Lawrence, A) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Caleb Bronson. (Lawrence, A) | |
1 | 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Jeff Dirkse by Caleb Bronson.. (Lawrence, A) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |