N. v. United States of America et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04273 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Prisons
|
|
Defendant
Smtih
|
|
Defendant
The Estate of Nicholas Theodore Ramos
|
|
Defendant
United States Department of Justice
|
|
Plaintiff
L. N.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/19 10:50 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings.Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by The Clerk on 07/19/2024.(kxo, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 RELATED CASE ORDER. 24-cv-4273-JSC is related to 22-cv-5137-YGR. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/18/2024. (eac, COURT STAFF) | |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/17/2024. (ahm, COURT STAFF) | |
7 | 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (krp, COURT STAFF) | |
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to United States of America, The Estate of Nicholas Theodore Ramos, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (krp, COURT STAFF) | |
5 | 5 Case assigned to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (smc, COURT STAFF) | |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 MOTION Application To Maintain The Anonymity Of Plaintiff filed by L. N. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2024 08:30 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined before Judge. Responses due by 7/30/2024. Replies due by 8/6/2024.(Gaines, Jeffrey) Modified text on 7/17/2024 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by L. N... (Gaines, Jeffrey) | |
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Gaines, Jeffrey) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for damages against United States of America, Federal Bureau of Prisons, The Estate of Nicholas Theodore Ramos, United States Department of Justice, Smtih (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19623948.). Filed by L. N.(Gaines, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/17/2024 (krp, COURT STAFF) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint -Exh 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint- Exh-2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet CCCS |